Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Rainer Berg (until 2011-06-30) | 1965-08-21 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Harry Deutinger (from 2005-04-12) (until 2007-03-19) | 1947-02-13 | ||||
Andreas Brehme (until 2005-04-11) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Harry Deutinger (until 2005-04-11) | 1947-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Philipp Heerwagen (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-04-13 | |||
12 | Ermin Hasic (from 2005-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-05-19 | |||
25 | Marcus Stolzenberg (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-10-01 | |||
35 | Stefan Brasas (until 2005-06-30) | 1967-08-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Norman Loose (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-01-10 | |||
4 | Ralf Bucher (until 2009-06-30) | 1972-04-06 | |||
7 | Bruno Custos (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-04-29 | |||
13 | Necat Aygun (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-02-26 | |||
14 | Mario Stieglmair (until 2005-12-31) | 1975-08-17 | |||
16 | Darlington Omodiagbe (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-07-02 | |||
22 | Ivica Majstorovic (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-09-20 | |||
23 | Dominik Haas (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-11-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Carsten Strasser (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-07-05 | |||
5 | Matthias Zimmermann (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-09-14 | |||
6 | Matthias Lust (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-04-27 | |||
8 | Barbaros Barut (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-01-26 | |||
10 | Francisco Copado (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-07-19 | |||
17 | Miroslav Stevic (from 2005-01-26) (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-01-07 | |||
19 | Charles Akonnor (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-03-12 | |||
20 | Thomas Sobotzik (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-10-16 | |||
21 | Goran Sukalo (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-08-24 | |||
24 | Oliver Rosgen (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-08-29 | |||
26 | Elton da Costa (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-12-15 | |||
28 | Rajko Tavcar (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-07-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Marcel Schied (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-07-28 | |||
11 | Silvio Adzic (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-09-23 | |||
18 | Angelo Vaccaro (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-10-04 | |||
24 | Robert Lechleiter (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-07-01 | |||
27 | Ibrahim Aydemir (from 2005-05-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-05-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2004-08-08 15:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2004-08-15 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2004-08-29 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2004-09-12 15:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2004-09-19 15:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2004-09-26 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2004-10-01 19:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2004-10-15 19:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2004-10-22 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-10-26 17:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2004-10-29 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2004-11-05 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2004-11-15 20:15 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2004-11-21 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2004-11-28 15:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2004-12-05 15:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2004-12-12 15:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-01-23 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-01-30 15:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-02-06 15:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2005-02-11 19:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-02-20 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-02-27 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-03-13 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-03-20 15:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-04-03 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2005-04-06 18:15 |
0 : 2 rat. |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-04-10 15:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-04-17 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2005-04-25 20:15 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2005-04-29 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-05-08 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-05-15 15:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2005-05-22 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |