Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Rudiger Vollborn (until 2012-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Sascha Lewandowski (from 2012-04-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1971-10-05 | ||||
Robin Dutt (until 2012-03-31) | 1965-01-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Sami Hyypia (from 2012-04-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1973-10-07 | ||||
Marco Langner (until 2012-03-31) | 1969-05-08 | ||||
Damir Buric (until 2012-03-31) | 1964-07-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rene Adler (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-01-15 | |||
22 | David Yelldell (until 2016-06-30) | 1981-10-01 | |||
23 | Bernd Leno (from 2011-08-10) (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-03-04 | |||
36 | Fabian Giefer (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-05-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Daniel Schwaab (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-08-23 | |||
4 | Bastian Oczipka (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-01-12 | |||
5 | Manuel Friedrich (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-09-13 | |||
14 | Vedran Corluka (from 2012-01-31) (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-02-05 | |||
20 | Danny da Costa (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-07-13 | |||
21 | Omer Toprak (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-07-21 | |||
24 | Michal Kadlec (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-12-13 | |||
27 | Gonzalo Castro (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-06-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christoph Kramer (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-02-19 | ||||
3 | Stefan Reinartz (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-01-01 | |||
6 | Simon Rolfes (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-01-21 | |||
7 | Tranquillo Barnetta (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-05-22 | |||
8 | Lars Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
10 | Renato Augusto (until 2012-12-31) | 1988-02-08 | |||
13 | Michael Ballack (until 2012-06-30) | 1976-09-26 | |||
14 | Hanno Balitsch (until 2012-01-07) | 1981-01-02 | |||
17 | Michael Ortega (from 2011-08-17) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-04-06 | |||
18 | Sidney Sam (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-01-31 | |||
23 | Arturo Vidal (until 2011-07-20) | 1987-05-22 | |||
28 | Erik Zenga (from 2012-03-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-01-18 | |||
38 | Karim Bellarabi (until 2013-08-20) | 1990-04-08 | |||
42 | Kolja Pusch (from 2012-03-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-02-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Andre Schurrle (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-11-06 | |||
11 | Stefan Kiessling (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-01-25 | |||
19 | Eren Derdiyok (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-06-12 | |||
31 | Nicolai Jorgensen (until 2011-12-31) | 1991-01-15 | |||
41 | Samed Yesil (from 2012-01-22) (until 2012-06-30) | 1994-05-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2011-09-13 20:45 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-09-28 20:45 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-10-19 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2011-11-01 20:45 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-11-23 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2011-12-06 20:45 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-02-14 20:45 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-03-07 20:45 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |