Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Branko Zebec (until 1978-06-30) | 1929-05-17 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1979-03-21) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernd Franke (until 1985-06-30) | 1948-02-12 | ||||
Uwe Hain (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Eckhard Vofrei (until 1976-06-30) | 1956-01-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Franz Merkhoffer (until 1984-06-30) | 1946-11-29 | ||||
Reiner Hollmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-09-30 | ||||
Dieter Zembski (until 1980-06-30) | 1946-11-06 | ||||
Friedhelm Haebermann (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-07-24 | ||||
Wolfgang Grzyb (until 1978-06-30) | 1940-07-29 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Hellfritz (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-09-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dietmar Erler (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-04-07 | ||||
Danilo Popivoda (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-05-01 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Handschuh (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-11-30 | ||||
Wolfgang Dremmler (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-07-12 | ||||
Aleksandar Ristic (until 1978-06-30) | 1944-06-28 | ||||
Manfred Grawunder (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-03-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Frank (until 1977-09-30) | 1951-02-21 | ||||
Bernd Gersdorff (until 1976-11-30) | 1946-11-18 | ||||
Hartmut Konschal (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-04-02 | ||||
Ludwig Brundl (until 1976-06-30) | 1946-11-23 | ||||
Jaro Deppe (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-04-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1975-08-03 00:00 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-10-18 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-12-13 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-01-31 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |