Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christoph John (until 2007-06-30) | 1958-12-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Thomas Kessler (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-01-20 | ||||
Benjamin Finke (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-09-09 | ||||
Dieter Paucken (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-09-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Carsten Cullmann (from 2006-02-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-03-05 | ||||
Stefan Schwellenbach (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-03-17 | ||||
Dennis Esser (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-04-20 | ||||
Kevin Schoneberg (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-08-24 | ||||
Sebastian Zinke (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-02-20 | ||||
Tobias Nickenig (until 2007-01-29) | 1984-08-01 | ||||
Marvin Matip (until 2006-10-31) | 1985-09-25 | ||||
Roland Benschneider (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-08-22 | ||||
Alaattin Tosun (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-11-10 | ||||
Bjorn Schlicke (from 2006-02-01) (until 2006-02-28) | 1981-06-23 | ||||
Timo Achenbach (until 2005-08-01) | 1982-09-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mike Wunderlich (until 2008-12-31) | 1986-03-25 | ||||
Adem Demir (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-03-31 | ||||
Enis Alushi (until 2007-01-29) | 1985-12-22 | ||||
Christian Schlosser (until 2006-12-31) | 1985-07-15 | ||||
Sebastian Schindzielorz (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-01-21 | ||||
Christian Rahn (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-06-15 | ||||
Markus Feulner (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-02-12 | ||||
Mark Zeh (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-11-19 | ||||
Gerard Sambou (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-10-29 | ||||
Denis Epstein (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-07-02 | ||||
Felix Bachmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-03-12 | ||||
Adil Chihi (until 2006-06-30) | 1988-02-21 | ||||
Julien Lucke (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-06-15 | ||||
Patrick Weiser (from 2006-03-01) (until 2006-03-31) | 1971-12-25 | ||||
Youssef Mokhtari (from 2006-02-01) (until 2006-02-28) | 1979-03-05 | ||||
Jurgen Heinrichs (until 2005-12-31) | 1977-01-21 | ||||
Andrew Sinkala (from 2005-10-28) (until 2005-11-30) | 1979-06-18 | ||||
Christian Springer (from 2005-09-01) (until 2005-09-30) | 1971-07-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Marius Laux (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-02-07 | ||||
Bastian Volkert (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-11-30 | ||||
Daniel Chitsulo (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-03-07 | ||||
Patrick Helmes (from 2005-08-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-03-01 | ||||
Silvio Pagano (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-09-12 | ||||
Anthony Lurling (from 2005-08-18) (until 2005-08-22) | 1977-04-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2005-08-19 19:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |