Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Uwe Nagele (until 2006-06-30) | 1964-11-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (from 2006-01-10) (until 2006-05-24) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Roland Dickgiesser (from 2005-11-19) (until 2006-01-09) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Hansi Flick (until 2005-11-18) | 1965-02-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Alfred Schon (until 2006-06-30) | 1962-01-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Haas (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-08-01 | |||
20 | Thomas Hillenbrand (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-10-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Michael Zepek (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-01-19 | |||
5 | Marcel Throm (until 2007-12-31) | 1979-04-21 | |||
6 | Michael Rundio (from 2006-02-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-01-21 | |||
8 | Michael Kummerle (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-04-21 | |||
12 | Denis Bindnagel (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-06-05 | |||
15 | Mario Gottlicher (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-08-05 | |||
27 | Christian Daub (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-01-26 | |||
28 | Matthias Orum (until 2007-01-20) | 1975-11-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tim Bauer (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | ||||
3 | Roland Bonimeier (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-08-31) | 1982-05-22 | |||
6 | Matthias Born (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-03-09 | |||
7 | Dragan Paljic (until 2008-08-18) | 1983-04-08 | |||
10 | Selim Teber (from 2006-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-03-07 | |||
10 | Thomas Ollhoff (until 2005-09-16) | 1975-06-15 | |||
11 | Jochen Seitz (from 2006-01-13) (until 2009-01-06) | 1976-10-11 | |||
13 | Martin Lanig (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-07-11 | |||
16 | Matthias Keller (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-11-20 | |||
17 | Sandro Cescutti (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-04-06 | |||
18 | Nevzet Zukic (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-02-09 | |||
19 | Sebastian Hofmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-09-12 | |||
21 | Timo Bottjer (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-05-31 | |||
23 | Serhat Gulbas (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-12-24 | |||
24 | Sascha Boller (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-02-16 | |||
25 | Alexander Huber (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-02-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Thomas Pelka (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-08-23 | ||||
2 | Bjorn Weber (until 2005-12-31) | 1981-12-19 | |||
9 | Tomislav Maric (from 2006-01-16) (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-01-28 | |||
9 | Kai Herdling (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-06-27 | |||
9 | Daniel Reule (until 2005-12-31) | 1983-05-02 | |||
11 | Danny Winkler (until 2005-12-31) | 1973-08-16 | |||
14 | Sahr Senesie (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-05-26 | |||
22 | Alexander Blessin (until 2006-08-17) | 1973-05-28 | |||
34 | Danny Winkler (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-08-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2005-08-21 14:30 |
3 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |