Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Rudiger Vollborn (until 2012-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Bruno Labbadia (until 2009-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Eddy Sozer (until 2009-06-30) | 1968-07-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rene Adler (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-01-15 | |||
21 | Gabor Kiraly (from 2009-01-30) (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-04-01 | |||
22 | Benedikt Fernandez (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-01-08 | |||
34 | Erik Domaschke (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-11-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Karim Haggui (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-01-20 | |||
3 | Henrique (from 2008-07-18) (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-10-14 | |||
5 | Manuel Friedrich (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-09-13 | |||
15 | Hans Sarpei (until 2010-08-25) | 1976-06-28 | |||
18 | Constant Djakpa (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-10-17 | |||
20 | Lukas Sinkiewicz (until 2010-07-21) | 1985-10-09 | |||
24 | Michal Kadlec (from 2008-08-27) (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-12-13 | |||
27 | Gonzalo Castro (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-06-11 | |||
33 | Stefan Reinartz (until 2008-12-31) | 1989-01-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Simon Rolfes (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-01-21 | |||
7 | Tranquillo Barnetta (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-05-22 | |||
8 | Renato Augusto (from 2008-07-10) (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-02-08 | |||
14 | Sascha Dum (until 2009-08-25) | 1986-07-03 | |||
16 | Pirmin Schwegler (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-03-09 | |||
17 | Vratislav Gresko (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-07-24 | |||
19 | Thomas Zdebel (from 2009-01-07) (until 2009-06-30) | 1973-05-25 | |||
19 | Marcel Risse (until 2008-12-31) | 1989-12-17 | |||
23 | Arturo Vidal (until 2011-07-20) | 1987-05-22 | |||
25 | Bernd Schneider (until 2009-06-30) | 1973-11-17 | |||
26 | Thanos Petsos (from 2009-06-01) (until 2010-08-30) | 1991-06-05 | |||
39 | Toni Kroos (from 2009-01-31) (until 2010-06-30) | 1990-01-04 | |||
45 | Jens Hegeler (until 2009-01-06) | 1988-01-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Patrick Helmes (until 2011-01-30) | 1984-03-01 | |||
10 | Theofanis Gekas (until 2009-01-31) | 1980-05-23 | |||
11 | Stefan Kiessling (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-01-25 | |||
13 | Dmitri Bulykin (until 2008-08-18) | 1979-11-20 | |||
21 | Atanas Kurdow (until 2008-12-31) | 1988-09-28 | |||
29 | Angelos Charisteas (from 2009-02-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-02-09 | |||
51 | Richard Sukuta-Pasu (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-06-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2008-08-10 17:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2008-09-23 20:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2009-01-28 19:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2009-03-04 20:30 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2009-04-21 20:30 |
4 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2009-05-30 20:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |