Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Manfred Petz (until 2014-06-30) | 1961-05-05 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (from 2014-05-21) (until 2015-05-26) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Armin Veh (until 2014-06-30) | 1961-02-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Reiner Geyer (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-04-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Kevin Trapp (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-07-08 | |||
30 | Felix Wiedwald (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-03-15 | |||
32 | Aykut Ozer (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-01-01 | |||
35 | Marco Aulbach (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-07-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Vadim Demidov (until 2013-09-01) | 1986-10-10 | ||||
4 | Marco Russ (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-08-04 | |||
5 | Carlos Zambrano (until 2016-07-03) | 1989-07-10 | |||
6 | Bastian Oczipka (until 2017-07-14) | 1989-01-12 | |||
15 | Constant Djakpa (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-10-17 | |||
22 | Stefano Celozzi (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-11-02 | |||
23 | Bamba Anderson (until 2017-04-26) | 1988-01-10 | |||
24 | Sebastian Jung (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-06-22 | |||
34 | Erik Wille (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-03-28 | |||
36 | Marc-Oliver Kempf (until 2014-07-14) | 1995-01-28 | |||
39 | Alexander Madlung (from 2014-01-02) (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-07-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Jan Rosenthal (until 2015-02-01) | 1986-04-07 | |||
8 | Takashi Inui (until 2015-08-26) | 1988-06-02 | |||
10 | Vaclav Kadlec (from 2013-08-18) (until 2015-02-18) | 1992-05-20 | |||
13 | Martin Lanig (until 2015-01-23) | 1984-07-11 | |||
16 | Stefan Aigner (until 2016-07-29) | 1987-08-20 | |||
17 | Stephan Schrock (until 2014-07-01) | 1986-08-21 | |||
18 | Johannes Flum (until 2017-01-05) | 1987-12-14 | |||
19 | Marvin Bakalorz (from 2013-07-22) (until 2014-01-06) | 1989-09-13 | |||
20 | Sebastian Rode (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-11 | |||
21 | Marc Stendera (until 2019-09-02) | 1995-12-10 | |||
25 | Tranquillo Barnetta (from 2013-09-02) (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-05-22 | |||
25 | Slobodan Medojevic (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-11-20 | |||
26 | Tobias Weis (from 2014-01-06) (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-07-30 | |||
27 | Pirmin Schwegler (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-03-09 | |||
28 | Sonny Kittel (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-01-06 | |||
33 | Alexander Hien (until 2014-08-31) | 1993-04-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Joselu (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-03-27 | |||
11 | Srdan Lakic (until 2014-01-30) | 1983-10-02 | |||
14 | Alexander Meier (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-01-17 | |||
37 | Luca Waldschmidt (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-05-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-08-04 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2013-09-25 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2013-12-04 20:30 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2014-02-11 20:45 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |