Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Wolfgang de Beer (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Klopp (until 2015-06-30) | 1967-06-16 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Zeljko Buvac (until 2015-06-30) | 1961-09-13 | ||||
Peter Krawietz (until 2015-06-30) | 1972-05-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Roman Weidenfeller (until 2018-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
20 | Marc Ziegler (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-06-13 | |||
31 | Lukas Kruse (until 2009-01-31) | 1983-07-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Young-Pyo Lee (from 2008-08-27) (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-04-23 | |||
4 | Neven Subotic (until 2017-01-25) | 1988-12-10 | |||
14 | Antonio Rukavina (until 2009-01-31) | 1984-01-26 | |||
15 | Mats Hummels (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-12-16 | |||
17 | Dede (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-04-18 | |||
21 | Robert Kovac (until 2009-01-27) | 1974-04-06 | |||
25 | Patrick Owomoyela (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-11-05 | |||
27 | Felipe Santana (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-03-17 | |||
29 | Marcel Schmelzer (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
32 | Uwe Hunemeier (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-01-09 | |||
33 | David Vrzogic (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-08-10 | |||
44 | Marc Hornschuh (from 2009-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-03-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Sebastian Kehl (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-02-13 | |||
6 | Florian Kringe (until 2009-08-30) | 1982-08-18 | |||
7 | Tinga (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-01-13 | |||
8 | Giovanni Federico (until 2008-12-31) | 1980-10-04 | |||
16 | Jakub Blaszczykowski (until 2015-08-31) | 1985-12-14 | |||
22 | Kevin-Prince Boateng (from 2009-01-11) (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-03-06 | |||
22 | Marc-Andre Kruska (until 2009-01-08) | 1987-06-29 | |||
23 | Nuri Sahin (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-09-05 | |||
24 | Daniel Gordon (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
30 | Tamas Hajnal (until 2011-01-30) | 1981-03-15 | |||
32 | Franck Njambe (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-10-24 | |||
36 | Yasin Oztekin (from 2009-01-01) (until 2011-01-02) | 1987-03-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Nelson Valdez (until 2010-08-16) | 1983-11-28 | |||
10 | Mohamed Zidan (from 2008-08-15) (until 2012-01-30) | 1981-12-11 | |||
10 | Mladen Petric (until 2008-08-14) | 1981-01-01 | |||
11 | Delron Buckley (until 2009-01-31) | 1977-12-07 | |||
13 | Alexander Frei (until 2009-07-15) | 1979-07-15 | |||
19 | Diego Klimowicz (until 2008-12-31) | 1974-07-06 | |||
34 | Bajram Sadrijaj (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-08-10 | |||
39 | Christopher Kullmann (from 2009-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-09-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2008-09-18 20:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2008-10-02 20:45 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |